Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Riesco Carbajo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela)

Titular Bishop of Limisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1902BornBercianos de Vidriales
25 Jul 192624.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 195855.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
15 Feb 195855.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Limisa
11 May 195855.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limisa
23 Nov 196967.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
2 Jul 197269.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain

MicroData Summary for Angel Riesco Carbajo:
Bishop Angel Riesco Carbajo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela)

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015