Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Hernández y Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tabasco, México

Titular Bishop of Tralles in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1864Born
2 Dec 191248.3AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
6 Apr 191348.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
25 May 191348.8InstalledBishop of Tabasco, México
23 Sep 192258.1ResignedBishop of Tabasco, México
23 Sep 192258.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
13 Jan 192661.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tabasco, México

MicroData Summary for Antonio Hernández y Rodríguez
Bishop Antonio Hernández y Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tabasco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTejupilco

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast