Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Harpigny

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1948 Born
7 Jul 197325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
22 May 200355.1AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
7 Sep 200355.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Guy Harpigny (VIAF: 3867772)
Bishop Guy Harpigny (born ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuttre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast