Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Anthony Victor Haelg (Hälg), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Ndanda

Titular Bishop of Baia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1906BornKirchberg, Switzerland
5 Nov 192821.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Mar 193225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Jan 194942.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ndanda, Tanzania
13 Jan 194942.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Baia
29 Jun 194942.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baia
15 Dec 194943.0SucceededAbbot of Ndanda, Tanzania
18 Dec 197266.0ResignedAbbot of Ndanda, Tanzania
29 Nov 197569.0DiedAbbot Emeritus of Ndanda, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Anthony Victor Haelg (Hälg):
Abbot Anthony Victor Haelg (Hälg) O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Ndanda

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015