Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Attilio Beltramino, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Iringa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1901BornVolvera, Italy
5 Apr 192423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
18 Feb 193634.9AppointedPrefect of Iringa, Tanzania
8 Jan 194846.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
8 Jan 194846.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iringa, Tanzania
27 May 194847.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
25 Mar 195352.0AppointedBishop of Iringa, Tanzania
3 Oct 196564.5DiedBishop of Iringa, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Attilio Beltramino:
Bishop Attilio Beltramino I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Iringa

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1948, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013