Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabio Berdini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cesena

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1865BornSan Elpidio a Mare
4 Jun 191549.6AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
25 Jul 191549.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
24 Jun 192660.7ResignedBishop of Cesena, Italy
24 Jun 192660.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
2 Mar 192862.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
22 Mar 193064.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabio Berdini:
Archbishop Fabio Berdini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cesena

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013