Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Gúrpide Beope

Deceased

Bishop of Bilbao, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1898Born
23 Sep 192325.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 195153.3AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
23 Sep 195153.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
19 Dec 195557.9AppointedBishop of Bilbao, Spain
18 Nov 196870.8DiedBishop of Bilbao, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Gúrpide Beope
Bishop Pablo Gúrpide Beope (born , died ) Bishop of Bilbao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOchagavia

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast