Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Zhao Feng Wu, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1920Born
22 Apr 194524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
1992²71.5SelectedAdministrator of Yanzhou [Yenchow], China
Dec 1992³72.4SelectedBishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow], China
18 May 199372.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow], China
15 Aug 200585.1DiedBishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Zhao Feng Wu
Bishop Thomas Zhao Feng Wu S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJinan
Ordained BishopJinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
Death Placenear Tengzhou City

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 21 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast