Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurindo Guizzardi, C.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1934 BornNova Bassano
20 Dec 195925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
4 Feb 198247.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Feb 198247.5SucceededBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 Apr 198247.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
28 Nov 200167.3AppointedBishop of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil
20 Oct 201076.2RetiredBishop of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Laurindo Guizzardi:
Bishop Laurindo Guizzardi C.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Foz do Iguaçu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Foz do Iguaçu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015