Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Nílton dos Santos Souza

Bishop of Amargosa, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1943 BornAmargosa
20 Dec 196926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Amargosa, Bahia, Brazil
4 Aug 198642.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil
9 Nov 198643.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil
31 Aug 198844.9AppointedBishop of Amargosa, Bahia, Brazil
30 Oct 198845.1InstalledBishop of Amargosa, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Nílton dos Santos Souza:
Bishop João Nílton dos Santos Souza (born ) Bishop of Amargosa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amargosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015