Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis Grondin

Archbishop of Rimouski, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1954 BornRimouski
21 May 198934.5Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
12 Dec 201157.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
12 Dec 201157.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Camplum
25 Feb 201257.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camplum
4 May 201560.5AppointedArchbishop of Rimouski, Québec, Canada
14 Jun 201560.6InstalledArchbishop of Rimouski, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Denis Grondin:
Archbishop Denis Grondin (born ) Archbishop of Rimouski

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Rimouski.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2011
  • c1: Website of the Diocese, 12 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,266
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 May 2015
  • i: CB, 5 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 6 May 2015