Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vicente Alejandro González y Robleto

Deceased

Archbishop of Managua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1884BornChinandega
21 Apr 190723.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 193247.8AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
1 May 193248.1Ordained BishopBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
9 Apr 193854.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
9 Apr 193854.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Odessus
6 Jan 195267.8SucceededArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
18 Jun 196884.2DiedArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Vicente Alejandro González y Robleto:
Archbishop Vicente Alejandro González y Robleto (born , died ) Archbishop of Managua

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013