Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Casanova y Estrada

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1844Born
12 Sep 187530.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Guatemala
21 Sep 187530.8Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
25 Jun 188540.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guatemala
15 Jan 188641.1AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
25 Jul 188641.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Guatemala
14 Apr 191368.4DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Casanova y Estrada (VIAF: 90800850)
Archbishop Ricardo Casanova y Estrada (born , died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala City, Archdiocese of Guatemala
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guatemala City, Archdiocese of Guatemala

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 33
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,796

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast