Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Donaldo Gonzalo Chávez Núñez

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (resigned the dignity of bishop)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1920Born
23 May 195434.3Ordained PriestPriest of Managua, Nicaragua
15 Feb 196646.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
15 Feb 196646.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Giru Mons
24 Apr 196646.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giru Mons
16 Feb 197050.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
197958.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Giru Mons
9 May 200080.3Died

MicroData Summary for Donaldo Gonzalo Chávez Núñez
Father Donaldo Gonzalo Chávez Núñez (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManagua, Archdiocese of Managua, Nicaragua
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Managua, Archdiocese of Managua, Nicaragua
Death PlaceManagua, Archdiocese of Managua, Nicaragua

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • fn/d: CB, 10 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast