Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Lamartine Soares

Deceased

Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1927Born
29 Oct 195023.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 196235.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
16 Nov 196235.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
3 Mar 196336.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fussala
2 Apr 198558.0AppointedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
18 Aug 198558.4DiedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Lamartine Soares
Archbishop José Lamartine Soares (born , died ) Archbishop of Maceió

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBezerros

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast