Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Juan Baseotto, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Argentina, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1932 Born
6 Apr 195725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Feb 199158.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Añatuya, Argentina
27 Apr 199159.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Añatuya, Argentina
21 Dec 199260.7SucceededBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
8 Nov 200270.5AppointedBishop of Argentina, Military
18 Dec 200270.7InstalledBishop of Argentina, Military
15 May 200775.1RetiredBishop of Argentina, Military

MicroData Summary for Antonio Juan Baseotto
Bishop Antonio Juan Baseotto C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Argentina, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Argentina, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast