Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald George Sproxton

Auxiliary Bishop of Perth

Titular Bishop of Timici


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1953 BornSubiaco
17 Dec 197724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
12 Dec 200148.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perth, Australia
12 Dec 200148.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Timici
21 Feb 200249.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Timici

MicroData Summary for Donald George Sproxton:
Bishop Donald George Sproxton (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Perth

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Perth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013