Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aristide Gonsallo

Bishop of Porto Novo, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1966 Born
27 Dec 199226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Parakou, Benin
24 Oct 201549.1AppointedBishop of Porto Novo, Benin
19 Dec 201549.2Ordained BishopBishop of Porto Novo, Benin

MicroData Summary for Aristide Gonsallo
Bishop Aristide Gonsallo (born ) Bishop of Porto Novo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotonou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Porto Novo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2015
  • c1: CB, 25 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2015
  • c2: CB, 16 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,692

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast