Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Gabriel Gembart

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1743Born
11 Aug 175815.3ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1771²27.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
26 Sep 181471.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Sep 181471.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
20 Nov 181471.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara
30 Dec 182178.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Gabriel Gembart
Bishop Józef Gabriel Gembart (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGostyczyna

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1814, Number 10
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,257
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,799
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast