Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Eliasz Ostrowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Bethsaida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1762Born
19 Dec 178927.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Mar 179027.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 181553.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
18 Dec 181553.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
30 Jun 181653.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
4 Sep 183169.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Daniel Eliasz Ostrowski
Bishop Daniel Eliasz Ostrowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaluszyn

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 47
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,258
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast