Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William Cardinal Goh Seng Chye

Archbishop of Singapore

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” in Ostia mare


Motto: Ut Vivant


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1957 Born
1 May 198527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Singapore
29 Dec 201255.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Singapore
22 Feb 201355.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Singapore
20 May 201355.9SucceededArchbishop of Singapore
27 Aug 202265.1Elevated to Cardinal
27 Aug 202265.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” in Ostia mare
23 Apr 202365.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” in Ostia mare

MicroData Summary
William Goh Seng Chye
William Cardinal Goh Seng Chye
(born )
Archbishop of Singapore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSingapore, Archdiocese of Singapore
Ordained BishopSingapore Expo, Singapore, Archdiocese of Singapore

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Singapore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2012
  • ob: CB, 10 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 18 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,658
  • s: Bollettino, 20 May 2013
  • card: Bollettino, 29 May 2022
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2022
  • i: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025