Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicholas Chia Yeck Joo

Archbishop Emeritus of Singapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1938 BornSingapore
26 Jan 196425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Malacca-Singapore
15 May 200163.1AppointedArchbishop of Singapore
7 Oct 200163.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Singapore
20 May 201375.1RetiredArchbishop of Singapore

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Chia Yeck Joo:
Archbishop Nicholas Chia Yeck Joo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Singapore

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Singapore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,069
  • r: Bollettino, 20 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013