Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter James Cullinane

Bishop Emeritus of Palmerston North, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1936 Born
13 Dec 196125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wellington, New Zealand
6 Mar 198043.2AppointedBishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand
23 Apr 198043.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand
22 Feb 201275.2RetiredBishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand

MicroData Summary
Peter James Cullinane
Bishop Peter James Cullinane
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Palmerston North

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDannevirke, Archdiocese of Wellington
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Palmerston North, Diocese of Palmerston North

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palmerston North.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,089

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025