Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Gérin y Boulay, P.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Choluteca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1913BornCoaticook, Canada
28 Jun 193623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
9 Sep 196451.3AppointedPrelate of Choluteca, Honduras
30 Dec 196653.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mibiarca
23 Apr 196754.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mibiarca
4 Sep 197966.3AppointedBishop of Choluteca, Honduras
14 Apr 198470.9RetiredBishop of Choluteca, Honduras
1 Jun 199784.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Choluteca, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Marcel Gérin y Boulay:
Bishop Marcel Gérin y Boulay P.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Choluteca

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013