Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Musie Ghebreghiorghis, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1949 Born
18 May 197424.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Jun 197626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Nov 200354.3AppointedBishop of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
8 Feb 200454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
15 Feb 200454.5InstalledBishop of Emdeber (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Musie Ghebreghiorghis
Bishop Musie Ghebreghiorghis O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Emdeber

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAderho

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Emdeber (Ethiopian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,528

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast