Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodorus van Ruijven (van Ruyven), C.M.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nekemte, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Utimma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1938 Born
2 Sep 195719.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
19 Mar 196425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
9 Jul 199860.1AppointedPrefect of Jimma-Bonga, Ethiopia
23 Jul 200971.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia
23 Jul 200971.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Utimma
30 Aug 200971.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utimma
10 Nov 201375.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Theodorus van Ruijven (van Ruyven)
Bishop Theodorus van Ruijven (van Ruyven) C.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nekemte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRijswijk, Netherlands

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Nekemte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,267
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast