Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Markos Ghebremedhin, C.M.

Vicar Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1966 Born
26 Sep 199225.8Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Mission
19 Sep 199326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 Dec 200943.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga, Ethiopia
5 Dec 200943.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
24 Jan 201043.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari

MicroData Summary for Markos Ghebremedhin
Bishop Markos Ghebremedhin C.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShappa

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,559

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast