Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lisane-Christos Matheos Semahun

Bishop of Bahir Dar - Dessie (Ethiopian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1959 BornAddis Abeba
8 May 198828.3Ordained PriestPriest of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
5 Jan 201050.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
5 Jan 201050.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
18 Apr 201050.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
19 Jan 201555.0AppointedBishop of Bahir Dar - Dessie (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Lisane-Christos Matheos Semahun:
Bishop Lisane-Christos Matheos Semahun (born ) Bishop of Bahir Dar - Dessie

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Bahir Dar - Dessie (Ethiopian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,626
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 11 May 2015