Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Hermes Garin Bruzzone

Auxiliary Bishop of Canelones

Titular Bishop of Benepota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1947 BornSan Ramón
31 May 197326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Canelones, Uruguay
15 Jun 200255.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Canelones, Uruguay
15 Jun 200255.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Benepota
8 Sep 200255.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benepota

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Hermes Garin Bruzzone:
Bishop Leopoldo Hermes Garin Bruzzone (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Canelones

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Canelones.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015