Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Malcolm Patrick Galt, C.S.Sp.

Bishop Emeritus of Bridgetown, Barbados


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1929 BornPort of Spain
10 Jul 195526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
23 Apr 199565.7AppointedBishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles
25 Jul 199566.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles
31 May 200575.8RetiredBishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Malcolm Patrick Galt
Bishop Malcolm Patrick Galt C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bridgetown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bridgetown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,575

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 20 Feb 2016