Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Maximin County, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Kingstown, Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1960 Born
9 Sep 199130.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
9 Sep 199433.7Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Jan 199635.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
22 Dec 201555.0AppointedBishop of Kingstown, Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
20 Feb 201655.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kingstown, Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Gerard Maximin County
Bishop Gerard Maximin County C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Kingstown

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kingstown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Dec 2015
  • mn/bp: CB, 28 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 26 Jan 2016
  • c2+: CB, 18 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,846

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 May 2018

Quantcast