Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Jason Gordon

Bishop of Bridgetown, Barbados


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1959 BornPort of Spain
19 Mar 199132.0Ordained PriestPriest of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
8 Jul 201152.3AppointedBishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles
8 Jul 201152.3AppointedBishop of Kingstown, Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
21 Sep 201152.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles
23 Sep 201152.5InstalledBishop of Kingstown, Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
22 Dec 201556.7ResignedBishop of Kingstown, Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Charles Jason Gordon:
Bishop Charles Jason Gordon (born ) Bishop of Bridgetown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bridgetown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+/i: CB, 31 Jul 2011
  • c2: CB, 21 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,146
  • r?: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 22 Dec 2015