Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Francis Hickey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York

Titular Archbishop of Viminacium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1861BornRochester
25 Mar 188423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
18 Feb 190544.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA
18 Feb 190544.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Berenice
24 May 190544.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berenice
18 Jan 190948.0SucceededBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
30 Oct 192867.7ResignedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
30 Oct 192867.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Viminacium
10 Dec 194079.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Hickey:
Archbishop Thomas Francis Hickey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rochester

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013