Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Charles des Alries du Rousset

Deceased

Bishop of Béziers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1662¹BornRousset
15 Apr 170240.2SelectedBishop of Béziers, France
25 Sep 170240.7ConfirmedBishop of Béziers, France
3 Dec 170240.9Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
6 Sep 174482.6DiedBishop of Béziers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles des Alries du Rousset:
Bishop Louis-Charles des Alries du Rousset (born 1662, died ) Bishop of Béziers

  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015