Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Everardus Antonius M. Baaij, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1921Born
20 Jul 194726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
17 Dec 197352.7AppointedBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
23 May 197453.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
30 Oct 198160.5ResignedBishop of Aliwal, South Africa
31 Jan 201290.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Aliwal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Everardus Antonius M. Baaij
Bishop Everardus Antonius M. Baaij S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRotterdam, Netherlands

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 2 Feb 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast