Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie-Georges-Michel Goupy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Blois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1914BornSaint-Ouen-les-Vignes
6 Jan 194025.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 196045.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Blois, France
6 Feb 196045.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonis
3 May 196045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonis
28 Nov 196147.1SucceededBishop of Blois, France
25 Jul 199075.7RetiredBishop of Blois, France
28 Apr 199984.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Georges-Michel Goupy:
Bishop Joseph-Marie-Georges-Michel Goupy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Blois

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 37
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013