Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Feßler (Fessler)

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1813Born
24 Jul 183723.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
30 Jul 183723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
7 Apr 186248.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
7 Apr 186248.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
18 May 186248.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
23 Sep 186450.8SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
27 Mar 186551.3ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
30 Apr 186551.4InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
25 Apr 187258.3DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Feßler (Fessler) (VIAF: 34451179)
Bishop Joseph Feßler (Fessler) (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLochau (Vorarlberg), Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
Ordained BishopBrixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 307, and Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast