Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni de Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor)


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1640AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
9 Dec 1640Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
10 Jul 1645AppointedBishop of Chiron, Greece
10 Nov 1653AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
1667¹DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Rossi:
Bishop Giovanni de Rossi , Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 150, and Page 104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015