Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sallustio Pecólo (Pecoli)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornTerni
28 Oct 164040.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 164040.9AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
9 Dec 164040.9Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
13 Mar 164848.1ResignedBishop of Venosa, Italy
7 Jan 165151.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sallustio Pecólo (Pecoli):
Bishop Sallustio Pecólo (Pecoli) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Venosa

  • a priest for 10.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015