Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Serristori

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornFirenze
19 Mar 163333.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 163434.7AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
10 Dec 163434.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
Aug 1656³56.5DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Serristori:
Bishop Ludovico Serristori , Bishop of Cortona

  • a priest for 23.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 166
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015