Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Durazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Brugnato


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jan 1640AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
22 Jan 1640Ordained BishopBishop of Brugnato, Italy
15 May 1652DiedBishop of Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Durazzi:
Bishop Francesco Durazzi (died ) Bishop of Brugnato

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 122
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 104, Number 632

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013