Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Visconti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cremona


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1640AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
9 Dec 1640Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
13 Apr 1643AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
16 Oct 1670ResignedBishop of Cremona, Italy
4 Oct 1681DiedBishop Emeritus of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Visconti:
Bishop Francesco Visconti (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cremona

  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 167, and Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015