Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Eusanio, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619²BornPrata d’Ansidonia
2 Dec 166950.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
4 May 167051.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
2 May 167253.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
23 Apr 169273.3DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Eusanio:
Bishop Giuseppe Eusanio O.S.A. (died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • bp/bd/c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014