Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Genet

Deceased

Bishop of Vaison


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1640BornAvignon
19 Sep 166524.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 166525.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 168645.4AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
25 Mar 168645.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
17 Oct 170262.0DiedBishop of Vaison, France

MicroData Summary for François Genet:
Bishop François Genet (born , died ) Bishop of Vaison

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 406
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015