Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Muzio Soriano

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1629BornCotrone
22 May 165525.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 167444.3AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
4 Mar 167444.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
26 Aug 167949.8DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Muzio Soriano:
Archbishop Muzio Soriano (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1674, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015