Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Naldini, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1632BornPadova
18 Sep 165522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
11 Mar 168653.4AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
25 Mar 168653.4Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
21 Apr 171380.5DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Paolo Naldini:
Bishop Paolo Naldini O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 231
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014