Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Arnoz, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe

Titular Bishop of Busiris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1885Born
25 Jul 191025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
27 Apr 193146.0AppointedSuperior of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
11 Nov 193247.6AppointedPrefect of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
13 Apr 193752.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Busiris
13 Apr 193752.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
30 May 193752.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Busiris
26 Feb 195064.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Arnoz
Bishop Ignatius Arnoz C.M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bulawayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBodenbach, Czech Republic

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,937, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast