Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Teodoro del Valle Seoane

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lima

Titular Archbishop of Berytus

Apostolic Administrator of Huánuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1813BornHatun-Jauja
24 Sep 183622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Aug 185238.7IncardinatedPriest of Lima, Peru
2 Nov 186451.0SelectedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
27 Mar 186551.4ConfirmedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
6 Aug 186551.7Ordained BishopBishop of Huánuco, Peru
19 Mar 186652.4InstalledBishop of Huánuco, Peru
4 Jun 187258.6AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
15 Nov 187259.0ResignedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
15 Nov 187259.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berytus
19 Nov 187259.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Huánuco, Peru
16 Oct 188874.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Manuel Teodoro del Valle Seoane:
Archbishop Manuel Teodoro del Valle Seoane (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lima

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 148, and Page 310
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 342
  • c1: LB, 26 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013