Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tzaneen

Dioecesis Tzaneensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joo No Rodrigues, Bishop
  • Hugh Patrick Slattery, M.S.C., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 18 July 1987
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pretoria
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 49,500 (19,119 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://dioceseoftzaneen.yolasite.com/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 31 Draai St., Tzaneen 0850, N. Transvaal, Limpopo Province, South Africa
  • Telephone: (015)307-5244

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Louis Trichardt
27 December 1962ErectedTerritorial Abbey of Pietersburg (Soutpansberg, Lataba, and Sibasa) Prefecture Apostolic of Louis Trichardt (erected)
Diocese of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen
16 November 1972ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Louis Trichardt Diocese of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen
Diocese of Tzaneen
18 July 1987Name ChangedDiocese of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen Diocese of Tzaneen

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Louis Trichardt
197014,683570,0002.6%223255872324ap1971
Diocese of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen
198023,5481,193,0002.0%19191,2392193120ap1981
Diocese of Tzaneen
199037,5501,556,0002.4%122231,6324283525ap1991
199947,7501,993,0052.4%214162,9844192816ap2000
200047,0812,002,1132.4%315182,6154202712ap2001
200147,3562,003,0002.4%314172,7854192812ap2002
200248,1852,030,0002.4%314172,8344183312ap2003
200348,6492,030,0002.4%318212,3164223312ap2004
200449,5432,200,0002.3%318212,3594223313ap2005
201048,5002,317,0002.1%425291,6724304113ap2011
201446,5002,415,0001.9%722291,6034224114ap2015
201747,2602,540,7601.9%921301,5753213614ap2018
202049,2002,646,4301.9%919281,7573192814ap2021
202250,6002,721,0501.9%1017271,8743172914ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Louis Trichardt
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 55, Page 943, and Page 944
  • Diocese of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 65, Page 120, and Page 121
  • Diocese of Tzaneen
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 1,109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024