Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Andrea Cardinal Pelagallo

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1747BornRome
19 Nov 180962.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Dec 180962.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 181568.7AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
18 Feb 181668.9Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
8 Mar 181668.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181668.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
6 Sep 182275.4DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Andrea Pelagallo:
Cardinal Carlo Andrea Pelagallo (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 12.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013